KY HB11 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 75 to define "city" and "fire district"; grant cities the primary right to provide fire protection services for city territory, subject to certain limitations; create a process for the provision of fire protection services to newly annexed territory; create a formula to determine the proportion of fire district indebtedness owed by the city and allow three years to pay this indebtedness; allow a fire district to continue to provide fire protection services in certain situations if written agreements are entered into with the city; amend KRS 75.010, 75.020, and 75.040 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to fire protection services.
Sponsors
Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 27) |
2013-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2013-03-05 | House | received in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2013-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2013-09-05 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Local Government |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB11.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB11/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB11/vote_history.pdf |