KY HB105 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 16 to allow State Police to charge a reasonable fee when persons request fingerprinting and photography for professional, trade, or commercial purposes or for personal use; amend KRS 64.090 to allow sheriffs to also charge a fee for requested fingerprinting and photography; create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to allow local governments to charge a fee for requested fingerprinting and photography; create a new section of KRS Chapter 70 to allow sheriffs to change a fee for requested fingerprinting and photographs.
Title
AN ACT relating to fees for fingerprinting and photography by law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 135) |
2014-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | passed 36-2 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-14 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-24 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-06 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |