KY HB100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 304.17A requiring that health benefit plans that provide benefits for autism spectrum disorders treatment provide a liaison to the insured to facilitate communication between the insured and the insurer.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance coverage of autism spectrum disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 102) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-04 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |