KY HB10 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend Section 29 of the Constitution of Kentucky to permit the General Assembly or an agency or committee it creates to review, approve, or disapprove any administrative regulation of the executive branch during or between regular sessions of the General Assembly; submit to the voters for approval or disapproval; supply ballot language.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend Section 29 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to administrative regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. William Wells [R] | Rep. Wesley Morgan [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 101 (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 68-22 |
2018-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | returned to Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | taken from Committee, placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-03 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-02 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
2017-06-27 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB10.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB10/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB10/vote_history.pdf |