KY HB10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - line items vetoed (Acts, ch.146)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - line items vetoed (Acts, ch.146)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 367.650 to 367.670 to require proper labeling on donation boxes and donation drop-off sites when the donations do not qualify as charitable contributions for federal tax purposes; amend KRS 367.668 to require lettering to be not less than 2 inches in height; amend KRS 367.665 to grant the county attorney concurrent jurisdiction and powers with the Attorney General and allow the county attorney to impose penalties which shall be paid to the county.
Title
AN ACT relating to donated clothing, household items, or other items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | line items vetoed (Acts, ch.146) |
2016-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-15 | House | passed 93-4 |
2016-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitutes (2) committee amendment (2-title) |
2016-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitutes (2) and committee amendment (2-title) |
2016-04-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-15 | House | received in House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | passed 34-3 with Committee Substitutes (2) committee amendment (2-title) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | committee amendments (1-title) Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2016-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 15, 2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (2) committee amendment (2-title) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-5 |
2016-02-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 2 |
2016-01-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-10-30 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |