KY HB1 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 3)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 3)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.020 to reduce the individual income tax to 4.5% for taxable years beginning January 1, 2023, and to 4% for taxable years beginning January 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to income taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2468 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 3) |
2023-02-09 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-02-09 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2023-02-09 | House | received in House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-5 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 08, 2023 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-01-06 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2023-01-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-01-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-19 |
2023-01-05 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-01-05 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-01-05 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-01-04 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-01-04 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | 1st reading |
2023-01-03 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | introduced in House |