KY HB1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create various new sections of KRS 205 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to utilize a single electronic benefit transfer card for each beneficiary; to prohibit beneficiaries from withdrawing cash using an electronic benefit transfer card; to prohibit the use of cash assistance benefits to purchase certain items or make purchases at certain establishments; to establish that an individual who traffics in electronic benefit transfer cards may be deemed ineligible for public assistance benefits; to restrict the use of Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits when purchasing certain beverages; to direct the cabinet to join the SNAP National Accuracy Clearinghouse; to require the cabinet to seek certain federal Medicaid and SNAP waivers; to require the cabinet to implement a community engagement program for Medicaid beneficiaries when Medicaid expenditures reach a certain level; and to direct the Attorney General to bring an action against the cabinet if the provisions of this act are not fully implemented; amend KRS 6.940 to reestablish the Medicaid Oversight and Advisory Committee as the Public Assistance Oversight and Advisory Committee; amend KRS 205.200 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to use only the most recent income data when determining eligibility; amend KRS 205.2005 to require that a Medicaid beneficiary who is convicted of a drug related felony offense seek substance use disorder treatment in order to remain eligible for benefits; amend KRS 205.725 to require the cabinet to upon receipt of an application for public assistance to take action to assure that the responsible parent or parents provides support to a child and to require that the custodial parent of a needy dependent child provide the cabinet with certain information to assist in assuring that child support is provided; and amend KRS 441.045 to require that a county jailer notify the cabinet when a county prisoner is incarcerated and when they are released.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public welfare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 138 (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 9 RCS# 137 (Y: 33 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 7 RCS# 136 (Y: 33 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 6 RCS# 135 (Y: 33 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 134 (Y: 30 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-17Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2020-02-26Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-21Housepassed 58-32 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendments (3), (4), (14), (15) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-21Housefloor amendments (1) (6) (7) and (9) defeated
2020-02-21Housefloor amendment (10) ruled not germane
2020-02-21House3rd reading
2020-02-20Housefloor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (6), (7), (8), (9), (10), (11), (12), (13), (14), and (15) filed to Committee Substitute; floor amendment (5) filed to bill
2020-02-20Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2020
2020-02-20Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-19Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-19House1st reading
2020-02-19Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-18Houseposted in committee
2020-01-29Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-01-27Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback