KY HB1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 159)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to establish the Child Welfare Oversight and Advisory Committee; amend KRS 194A.030 to remove the Office of the Ombudsman from within the Cabinet for Health and Family Services' Secretary’s Office and establish it as an independent office; amend KRS 199.461 to require additional reporting of statewide, regional, and county caseload average for state social service workers; amend KRS 199.470 to change the definition of relative caregiver for adoption purposes and align placement options with the Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children; amend KRS 199.641 to allow the cabinet to contract with child-caring facilities and child-placing agencies; amend KRS 199.800 to update definitions; amend KRS 199.801 to update and establish new processes for state-level and regional placement coordinators for children in the custody of the cabinet; create a new section of KRS 199.470 to 199.590 to require the cabinet to establish uniform home study processes; repeal and reenact KRS 200.575 to update and establish new processes for delivery of family preservation services; amend KRS 213.056 to change language required to be on a Kentucky birth certificate of a person adopted from outside the United States; amend KRS 213.141 to establish no birth certificate fees for a child who is in the custody of the cabinet; amend KRS 600.020 to expand the definition of “abused or neglected child”; amend KRS 605.120 to allow for a broader array of services, including monetary, for relative caregivers; amend KRS 610.040 to attempt to resolve conflicts regarding the service of process for courts; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to resolve delays due to simultaneous criminal proceedings during dependency, neglect, or abuse cases; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to allow the cabinet to charge a fee for background checks of child abuse and neglect records in certain circumstances; amend KRS 620.050 to establish new language related to Children’s Advocacy Centers in administrative hearings and access to the records and interviews; amend KRS 620.060 to clarify locations of dependency, neglect, or abuse cases for courts; amend KRS 620.070 to attempt to resolve conflicts regarding the service of process for courts; amend KRS 620.180 to lengthen the time before the first out-of-home case plan is due and require that by January 1, 2019, that CHFS shall establish and implement the processes, procedures, timelines, and requirements to ensure that children committed to the cabinet as dependent, neglected, or abused and placed in foster family homes are timely reunified with their biological family or identified for and placed in a new permanent home; amend KRS 620.270 to establish changes to the existing Citizen Foster Care Review Boards in the state to establish an interested party review to occur to allow a forum for citizens throughout the state to express their thoughts and opinions related to child welfare; amend KRS 620.090 related to notifications from the Citizen Foster Care Review Boards; amend KRS 620.310 to establish changes to the Citizen Foster Care Review Board related to the election of the chairpersons; amend KRS 625.090 related to the filing of a motion of termination of parental rights; amend KRS 625.110 related to the appeals of the termination of parental rights; create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to establish a putative father registry in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; prescribe the data the registry will contain and who may access the data; amend KRS 199.480 and 199.990 to conform; amend KRS 406.081 to require courts to resolve cases against alleged fathers who do not comply with ordered genetic testing; amend KRS 406.091 to require the party requesting that the paternity action be filed to pay for genetic testing; amend KRS 625.065 to the putative father registry; amend KRS 199.502 related to the putative father registry; create a new section of KRS 199.640 to199.670 to require performance-based contracting and require the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to designate a study group to make recommendations regarding the creation and implementation of performance-based contracting for licensed child-caring facilities and child-placing agencies in the Commonwealth and to require a report; create a new section of KRS 620 to establish a notification be made to foster parents; require the secretary of the cabinet for Health and Family services to designate a study group to make recommendations regarding the feasibility and implementation of the privatization of all foster care services in the Commonwealth and require a report; amend KRS 199.473, 199.490, 625.040, 625.042, and 625.043 to conform; repeal KRS 199.565, 199.805, 200.580, 200.585, 200.590, 200.595, 200.600, and 200.605.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to child welfare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 462 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 2 RSN# 695 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 193 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 159)
2018-04-02Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02HouseBill passed 90-1
2018-04-02HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2)
2018-04-02Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2)
2018-04-02Housetaken from Rules
2018-04-02Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-02Housereceived in House
2018-04-02Senatepassed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2)
2018-04-02Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2018-04-02Senate3rd reading
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-03-21Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-20Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-19Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-05Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-03-01Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-28House3rd reading, passed 94-1 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (2) and (3)
2018-02-27Housefloor amendment (3) Committee Substitute (1) filed
2018-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018
2018-02-26Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-16Houseposted in committee
2018-02-01Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-01-30Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback