KY HB1 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Propose to amend Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky to authorize the General Assembly to confer upon the proper authority of any city or county the power to levy a local option sales and use tax, subject to specifically enumerated conditions and limitations; submit to the voters for approval or disapproval; supply ballot language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing to amend Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to local levies of sales and use taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11Senatedischarge petition filed
2015-02-19Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2015-02-13Senatereceived in Senate
2015-02-12Housepassed 62-35 with Committee Substitute
2015-02-12Housefloor amendment (5) ruled not germane
2015-02-12Housefloor amendment (4) defeated
2015-02-12House3rd reading
2015-02-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015
2015-02-10Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2015-02-10Housefloor amendments (3) (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (6) filed
2015-02-09Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2015-02-06Housereturned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-02-06House2nd reading
2015-02-06Housetaken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-02-05Houseposted in committee
2015-02-05Housereturned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-02-05House1st reading
2015-02-05Housetaken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-01-08Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-01-06Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback