KY HB1 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - line items
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - line items
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend 2010 (1st Extra. Sess.) Kentucky Acts Chapter 1, the state/executive branch budget, to reallocate funds from fiscal year 2011-2012 to fiscal year 2010-2011 for Medicaid and postsecondary institutions; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT amending 2010-2012 branch budget bills, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] |
Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | line items | |
2011-03-24 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-24 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-24 | passed 86-2 | |
2011-03-24 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-24 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-24 | taken from Rules (H) | |
2011-03-24 | to Rules (H) | |
2011-03-24 | received in House | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd reading, passed 22-15 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-24 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2011 | |
2011-03-24 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-22 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-03-22 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-22 | 2nd reading | |
2011-03-22 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-21 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-21 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-21 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-21 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-21 | 3rd reading, passed 94-4 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-21 | placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-03-21 | taken from Rules (H) | |
2011-03-21 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-16 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-03-15 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd reading | |
2011-03-15 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-14 | posting waived | |
2011-03-14 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-14 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-14 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-14 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-14 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11SS/HB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11SS/HB1/bill.doc |