KY HB1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 170)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 170)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.720 relating to domestic violence definitions to define "global positioning monitoring system"; amend KRS 403.740 relating to emergency protective orders to permit a court to restrain a respondent from going to or near specified locations; amend KRS 403.750 relating to domestic violence orders to permit a court to restrain a respondent from going to or near specified locations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to permit the petitioner in a domestic violence order case to inform the court of places the petitioner does not want the respondent to go into or near; create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to require the court to assess the respondent's dangerousness; create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to a permit court, as part of a domestic violence order, to order a respondent to wear or carry global monitoring system device and permit a petitioner to carry a device notifying the petitioner that the respondent is nearby; require the court to notify the petitioner of the operation and limitations of global positioning monitoring system devices, and provide a penalty for removing or tampering with the device; create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to require the Department of Corrections to contract with entities providing global positioning system monitoring services to provide services meeting the requirements of the statutes; name act the Amanda Ross Domestic Violence Prevention Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to the use of global positioning monitoring systems including monitoring-related restrictions and sanctions in domestic violence cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 170) | |
2010-04-15 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-14 | Bill passed 100-0 | |
2010-04-14 | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House | |
2010-04-14 | received in House | |
2010-04-14 | Bill passed 37-0 | |
2010-04-14 | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-26 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-23 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-18 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-18 | received in House | |
2010-03-17 | passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-17 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2010-03-17 | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn | |
2010-03-17 | 3rd reading | |
2010-03-16 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 17, 2010 | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) | |
2010-03-16 | recommitted to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-14 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-01-13 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-12 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4-title) | |
2010-01-11 | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4-title) filed | |
2010-01-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 12, 2010 | |
2010-01-07 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-07 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-06 | posting waived | |
2010-01-06 | recommitted to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-06 | 1st reading | |
2010-01-06 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB1/bill.doc |