KS SR1760 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 05, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 05, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing February 5, 2016, as National Wear Red Day.
Title
Recognizing February 5, 2016, as National Wear Red Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 05, 2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted without roll call |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li_2016/b2015_16/measures/sr1760/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sr1760_enrolled.pdf |