KS SCR1618 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment that provides for legislative authority to revoke or suspend rules and regulations adopted by executive branch agencies and officials.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment that provides for legislative authority to revoke or suspend rules and regulations adopted by executive branch agencies and officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/scr1618/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/scr1618_00_0000.pdf |