KS SCR1612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment providing for phase out and complete exemption from sales and use taxation of food and food ingredients.
Title
Constitutional amendment providing for phase out and complete exemption from sales and use taxation of food and food ingredients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Motion by Senator Holland to advance SCR 1612 above the line. Motion failed. - Yea: 21 Nay: 19 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion by Senator Holland to advance SCR 1612 above the line. Motion failed. Yea: 21 Nay: 19 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |