KS SB98 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing medical student and residency loan assistance to encourage the practice of obstetrics and gynecology in medically underserved areas of the state.
Title
Authorizing medical student and residency loan assistance to encourage the practice of obstetrics and gynecology in medically underserved areas of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |