KS SB94 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing therefor from the state general fund.
Title
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing therefor from the state general fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |