KS SB90 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas rural housing incentive district act to permit bond funding for vertical residential renovation of older buildings in central business districts and by changing the definitions of an eligible city or county.
Title
Amending the Kansas rural housing incentive district act to permit bond funding for vertical residential renovation of older buildings in central business districts and by changing the definitions of an eligible city or county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 105 Nay: 17 (Y: 105 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 105 Nay: 17 (Y: 105 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 6, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 105 Nay: 17 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |