KS SB82 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring schools to establish policies and concussion management teams to prevent and manage concussions within school.
Title
Requiring schools to establish policies and concussion management teams to prevent and manage concussions within school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |