KS SB81 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance; certain exemptions from filing reports.
Title
Campaign finance; certain exemptions from filing reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb81/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb81_00_0000.pdf |