KS SB76 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act to provide a refund for certain increases in residential property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act to provide a refund for certain increases in residential property taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2021-01-27SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2021-01-26SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback