KS SB69 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Transportation - Providing for the love, Chloe foundation distinctive license plate and establishing a fee on firefighter distinctive license plates.
Title
House Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Transportation - Providing for the love, Chloe foundation distinctive license plate and establishing a fee on firefighter distinctive license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2021-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-12 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |