KS SB69 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Utilities - Requiring an electric rate study of certain electric utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 69 by Committee on Utilities - Requiring an electric rate study of certain electric utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 37 Nay: 1 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
2019-04-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSenate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 7
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Representative Bergquist raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finney
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2019-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 281-N
2019-03-15HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2019-03-15HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-14SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
2019-03-13SenateSenate Senator Skubal raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Utilities
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: (opponents) Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback