KS SB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the fees and agreements cities can require a wireless services provider to enter for the provision of wireless telecommunications service.
Title
Limiting the fees and agreements cities can require a wireless services provider to enter for the provision of wireless telecommunications service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 112 Nay: 12 (Y: 112 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 112 Nay: 12 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, February 7, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (neutral) Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |