KS SB63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 63 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Enacting the back to school act to require school districts to provide a full-time, in person attendance option for all students beginning March 31, 2021, for school year 2020-2021.
Title
House Substitute for SB 63 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Enacting the back to school act to require school districts to provide a full-time, in person attendance option for all students beginning March 31, 2021, for school year 2020-2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 77 Nay: 46 (Y: 77 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 77 Nay: 46 (Y: 77 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 26, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 28 Nay: 11 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes as conferees |
2021-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 77 Nay: 46 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2021-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |