KS SB63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating the use of lighting devices in transportation network company vehicles and requiring vehicles to stop at railroad crossings for on-track train equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the use of lighting devices in transportation network company vehicles and requiring vehicles to stop at railroad crossings for on-track train equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 101 Nay: 20 (Y: 101 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 101 Nay: 20
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees
2019-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson appointed as second conferees
2019-04-03HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-02HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees
2019-03-26SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback