KS SB62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 62 by Committee on Transportation - Allowing police vehicle drivers to engage in certain actions without using audible and visual signals and also allowing certain actions by drivers.
Title
Substitute for SB 62 by Committee on Transportation - Allowing police vehicle drivers to engage in certain actions without using audible and visual signals and also allowing certain actions by drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 4 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 29 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 29 (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 4 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 29 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |