KS SB61 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the tax credit for low income students scholarship program act to expand student eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 23 Nay: 14 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2021-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-02-12HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-02-11SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 23 Nay: 14
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 27 Nay: 12
2021-02-11SenateSenate Senator Baumgardner raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2021-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher
2021-02-04SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
2021-01-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-25SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb61/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb61_00_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb61_s_1030.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb61_s_1211.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb61_s_1208.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb61_s_1205.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb61_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb61_00_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210211171106_536674/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210211192343_442227/

Bill Comments

feedback