KS SB60 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 60 by Committee on Education - Authorizing participation by less than full-time students in activities regulated by Kansas state high school activities association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 60 by Committee on Education - Authorizing participation by less than full-time students in activities regulated by Kansas state high school activities association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 30 Nay: 9 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2015-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 112N
2015-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2015-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2015-02-26SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 30 Nay: 9
2015-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2015-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2015-02-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
2015-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 02, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2015-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback