KS SB60 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 01 June 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 01 June 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitue for SB 60 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice -- Relating to house arrest as a sanction for certain crimes, expungement of certain crminal records, authorizing grand jury petitions, eliminating automatic supreme court appeals for certain crimes and amending community corrections success and funding provisions.
Title
House Substitue for SB 60 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice -- Relating to house arrest as a sanction for certain crimes, expungement of certain crminal records, authorizing grand jury petitions, eliminating automatic supreme court appeals for certain crimes and amending community corrections success and funding provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 103 Nay: 13 (Y: 103 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 103 Nay: 13 (Y: 103 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 01 June 2012 | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 25, 2012 | |
2012-05-18 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-18 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-17 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 103 Nay: 13 | |
2012-05-17 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-17 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees | |
2011-03-28 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dillmore was adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dillmore | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton | |
2011-03-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-22 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2011-02-16 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-15 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced |