KS SB57 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB57 by the Committee on Elections-Qualifications for candidates seeking certain statewide offices.
Title
House Substitute for SB57 by the Committee on Elections-Qualifications for candidates seeking certain statewide offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Skubal was adopted |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Skubal |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Skubal was withdrawn |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Skubal |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Introduced |