KS SB556 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for the federal work opportunity tax credit and the employee retention credit disallowance.
Title
Providing for a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for the federal work opportunity tax credit and the employee retention credit disallowance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |