KS SB549 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain water right holders to withdraw from a groundwater management district under certain circumstances.
Title
Allowing certain water right holders to withdraw from a groundwater management district under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |