KS SB509 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the education opportunity tax credit to provide an income tax credit for taxpayers with eligible dependent children not enrolled in public school.
Title
Establishing the education opportunity tax credit to provide an income tax credit for taxpayers with eligible dependent children not enrolled in public school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Calendar |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |