KS SB50 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting internet social media terms of service that permit censorship of speech.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting internet social media terms of service that permit censorship of speech.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2023-02-13SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2023-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2023-01-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2023-01-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback