KS SB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas reinvestment act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas reinvestment act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, January 8, 2019 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb5/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb5_00_0000.pdf |