KS SB5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Making certain individuals eligible for restricted driving privileges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making certain individuals eligible for restricted driving privileges.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-31SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2017-01-19SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
2017-01-10SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-09SenateSenate Introduced
2017-01-09SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 06, 2016

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback