KS SB479 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a permanent memorial commemorating the Kansas suffragist movement to be placed in the state capitol and establishing the Kansas suffragist memorial fund.
Title
Authorizing a permanent memorial commemorating the Kansas suffragist movement to be placed in the state capitol and establishing the Kansas suffragist memorial fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2022-03-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-08 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 1, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |