KS SB47 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting cities and counties from regulating consumer merchandise and auxiliary containers for the consumption, transportation or protection of consumer merchandise.
Title
Prohibiting cities and counties from regulating consumer merchandise and auxiliary containers for the consumption, transportation or protection of consumer merchandise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |