KS SB466 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Title
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 24, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 152-S |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb466/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb466_00_0000.pdf |