KS SB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Title
Discontinuing state property tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing for financing from the state general fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |