KS SB460 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social and rehabilitative institutions; appointment of superintendents, physicians, employees and staff.
Title
Social and rehabilitative institutions; appointment of superintendents, physicians, employees and staff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb460/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb460_00_0000.pdf |