KS SB46 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for certain amounts received under employer-sponsored retirement plans.
Title
Providing a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for certain amounts received under employer-sponsored retirement plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |