KS SB457 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting public utilities from exercising eminent domain for the siting or placement of solar facilities.
Title
Prohibiting public utilities from exercising eminent domain for the siting or placement of solar facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2024-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fagg was adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fagg |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Utilities |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |