KS SB456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunday start time for the sale of liquor in retail liquor stores changed from 12 noon to 9 a.m.
Title
Sunday start time for the sale of liquor in retail liquor stores changed from 12 noon to 9 a.m.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 5, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |