KS SB455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Kansas sports wagering act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Kansas sports wagering act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Committee
2018-04-04SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, April 04, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 152-S
2018-03-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-03-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback