KS SB453 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding social security payments from household income and expanding eligibility related to increased property tax homestead property tax refund claims.
Title
Excluding social security payments from household income and expanding eligibility related to increased property tax homestead property tax refund claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |