KS SB453 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a program for early release from incarceration for parents in certain cases.
Title
Creating a program for early release from incarceration for parents in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2016-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |