KS SB451 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas expanded lottery act; racetrack gaming.
Title
Kansas expanded lottery act; racetrack gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, April 03, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 152-S |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb451/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb451_00_0000.pdf |