KS SB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a portion of United States highway No. 40 as John Carlin highway.
Title
Designating a portion of United States highway No. 40 as John Carlin highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |