KS SB447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase land in Kingman county.
Title
Authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase land in Kingman county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 22, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb447/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb447_00_0000.pdf |